Financial history CANDEL TRUST

Charity number: 700009
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2008 30/06/2009 30/06/2010 30/06/2011 30/06/2012
Total gross income £3.37k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £3.29k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A