Accounts and annual returns BEDALE RECREATION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 700072
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 14 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2014 12 August 2015 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2013 14 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2012 14 November 2013 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not Required