Financial history COVENTRY WEST INDIAN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 700106
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £21.08k £16.68k £27.82k £3.09k £1.43k
Total expenditure £13.71k £27.36k £19.83k £12.17k £600
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A