Accounts and annual returns THE CRAVEN GUILD OF HANDSPINNERS, WEAVERS AND DYERS

Charity number: 700428
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2010 19 July 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2009 25 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2009 Not Required