Accounts and annual returns ULVERSTON MIND

Charity Number: 700735
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 02 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 12 November 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 05 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 10 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 10 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 20 June 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 20 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 12 June 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 01 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 01 September 2005 On Time