Financial history LENTON MUSLIM CENTRE NOTTINGHAM

Charity number: 700782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £29.40k £30.94k £23.71k £53.11k £72.74k
Total expenditure £51.72k £35.73k £20.12k £35.04k £73.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A