Financial history STANTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 700875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.26k £19.88k £9.09k £3.43k £3.37k
Total expenditure £2.56k £4.65k £3.68k £11.17k £9.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.43k N/A N/A N/A