Accounts and annual returns CHESTER WOMEN'S HOSTEL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 700948
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 01 July 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 28 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 02 November 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 29 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 29 January 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 24 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 16 July 2010 On Time