Governing document Friends of Evergreen School, Warwick

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MAY 1986 AS AMENDED 2 APRIL 2001 as amended on 20 Jul 2020 as amended on 06 Nov 2020 as amended on 17 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
The object of the Association (the objects) is to advance the education of the children and young people of Evergreen School, in particular by: - Supporting the development of effective relationships between the staff, families and others associated with the school - Engaging in activities or providing experiences, resources or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the children and young people.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.