Trustees THE CHEPSTOW MALE VOICE CHOIR/COR MEIBION CAS-GWENT
Charity number: 701201

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Chris Godwin | Chair | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Anderson Treasurer | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN TAYLOR | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MAURICE COLIN PENNY | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Evans | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Blake | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ashok Jethwa | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALFONSO GIAQUINTO Secretary | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.