Financial history HOMER HILL RECREATION GROUND TRUST

Charity Number: 701251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £95.13k £87.56k £89.76k £94.41k £100.80k
Total expenditure £95.13k £87.56k £89.76k £94.41k £100.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A