Financial history GRACE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 701443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £44.11k £36.06k £42.72k £35.66k £43.97k
Total expenditure £47.33k £36.10k £36.02k £38.14k £43.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A