Trustees DROITWICH THEATRE AND ARTS CLUB LIMITED
Charity number: 701631

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS ANNE LANE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Katie Joy Ingram | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Steele | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Waters | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carole Hartle | Trustee | 12 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Grace Francesca Duggan | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Sinclair | Trustee | 15 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Brian Hooper | Trustee | 10 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
BEN PAUL THOMPSON | Trustee | 30 December 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.