Financial history LIVING WATERS MINISTRIES

Charity number: 701756
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £36.84k £38.42k £29.15k £30.52k £22.52k
Total expenditure £36.56k £32.59k £30.43k £48.82k £17.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A