Accounts and annual returns HEALTH LINCS

Charity number: 701808
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 01 February 2011 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 01 February 2011 1 days late
Annual return 31 March 2009 15 February 2010 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 15 February 2010 15 days late