Accounts and annual returns GREYSTONE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 701878
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 25 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 17 October 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 31 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 14 November 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 08 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 16 November 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 18 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 15 December 2010 On Time