Accounts and annual returns PULSE TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 701884
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 06 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 24 September 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 30 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required