Accounts and annual returns MELTON TIGERS SPORTS AND SOCIAL CLUB FOR THE DISABLED
Charity number: 701939

Charity reporting is overdue by 1528 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 67 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 67 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 432 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 432 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 798 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 798 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1163 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1163 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1528 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1528 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window