Accounts and annual returns PROVINCIAL GRAND CHARITY OF THE PROVINCE OF DERBYSHIRE

Charity number: 701963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 18 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 18 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 26 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 26 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 11 May 2023 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 11 May 2023 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 04 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 11 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window