Financial history NORTH OF ENGLAND BONE MARROW AND THALASSAEMIA ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 702007
Charity reporting is overdue by 119 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £3.60k £1.74k £0 £411 £1.54k
Total expenditure £724 £3.85k £836 £374 £400
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A