Accounts and annual returns ECCLESTON WINDLE BLEAK HILL COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL FRIENDS ASSOCIATION ALSO KNOWN AS FRIENDS OF BLEAK HILL SCHOOL

Charity number: 702242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 04 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 04 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 08 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 08 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 10 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required