Accounts and annual returns EMILY WEAVER TRUST FUND

Charity number: 702275
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 13 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 13 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 19 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required