Accounts and annual returns GIFFARD HOUSE AND CHAPEL WOLVERHAMPTON RESTORATION FUND

Charity number: 702447
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 August 2007 29 July 2008 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 August 2007 Not Required
Annual return 22 August 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 22 August 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 22 August 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 22 August 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 22 August 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 22 August 2004 Not submitted