Accounts and annual returns CARR HEAD SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 702448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 05 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 02 February 2023 217 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 March 2022 254 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required