Financial history EAST CHESHIRE COMMUNITY TRANSPORT

Charity Number: 702629
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £267.49k £293.58k £265.57k £396.40k £373.34k
Total expenditure £264.94k £291.62k £259.94k £448.05k £395.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A