Accounts and annual returns MILLENNIUM PHAB CLUB

Charity number: 702645
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 07 October 2009 249 days late
Annual return 31 March 2007 07 April 2009 432 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 08 October 2008 251 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time