Financial history REDCAR EAST COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 702824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £7.20k £18.22k £11.67k £9.05k £8.76k
Total expenditure £10.99k £19.72k £6.83k £5.93k £9.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.30k £2.67k N/A N/A