Financial history ST NICHOLAS HIGH SCHOOL APPEAL TRUST

Charity Number: 702988
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018
Total gross income £7.36k £4.82k £2.88k £1.95k £641
Total expenditure £16.86k £21.15k £14.48k £13.20k £5.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A