Accounts and annual returns NATIONAL SCHOOL FOR CHILDREN WITH CEREBRAL PALSY

Charity number: 703064
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2013 01 November 2014 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2012 22 October 2013 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2011 05 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2011 Not Required