Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF VANE ROAD SCHOOL

Charity Number: 703078
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 February 2023 235 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required