Financial history THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE BRECON HOSPITAL

Charity number: 703090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £40.29k £19.77k £19.47k £22.48k £28.03k
Total expenditure £40.07k £14.44k £17.11k £267.88k £26.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A