Financial history SOUTH WALNEY COUNTY JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 703094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.34k £38.76k £11.09k £7.89k £4.32k
Total expenditure £7.65k £39.28k £4.05k £1.34k £31.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £960 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A