Accounts and annual returns CAMBRIDGESHIRE BEEKEEPERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 800256
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 March 2021 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 March 2021 151 days late