Financial history THE WESTMINSTER SPIRITUAL AID FUND

Charity number: 800423
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013
Total gross income £7.31k £7.12k £1.32k £0 £0
Total expenditure £120 £120 £240.16k £0 £9.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A