Financial history GHANA WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 800578
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £1.50k £1.30k £1.30k £1.50k £1.60k
Total expenditure £4.59k £1.10k £1.10k £1.20k £1.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A