Accounts and annual returns MOORLANDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 800715
Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 March 2021 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required