Trustees UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE STEVENAGE
Charity Number: 801069

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lyn Anne Dutton | Chair | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Huttlestone Treasurer | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian James Alexander | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Margaret Holford | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Belton Mr | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margrit Susan Thompson | Trustee | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Leslie Darnton | Trustee | 01 February 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.