Accounts and annual returns HINTON CHARTERHOUSE OVER 60 CLUB

Charity Number: 801098
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2010 26 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2009 23 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2008 22 September 2009 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not Required