Financial history THE MELANIE ANN TRUST

Charity number: 801196
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £348.43k £389.81k £175.88k £181.22k £75.79k
Total expenditure £361.99k £329.17k £232.70k £216.53k £282.07k
Income from government contracts £348.43k £219.85k £170.02k £180.52k £75.79k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A