Accounts and annual returns INSURANCE INSTITUTE OF BRISTOLPROJECT PLAYWELL APPEAL FUND

Charity number: 801283
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 08 February 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 08 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 06 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 12 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required