Financial history Trewoon Village Hall

Charity number: 801357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.53k £5.77k £22.95k £18.87k £18.62k
Total expenditure £27.59k £4.47k £11.20k £10.96k £18.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £16.26k £2.67k £1.84k