Trustees CULVERSTONE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Charity number: 801359

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Courtney Boyson | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jo Regan | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Wooder | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Manroop Cheema | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Rutherford Browning | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Bushell | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Prockter | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey McNeill | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jan Dyer | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.