Financial history PRISON SERVICE CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 801678
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £146.51k £109.41k £140.69k £106.12k £172.04k
Total expenditure £102.99k £98.97k £89.83k £101.93k £107.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A