Financial history WESTWOOD HIGH SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 801753
Removed charity

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2004 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A