Trustees THE DANCE SCHOLARSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 802165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicola Westbury Trustee 01 February 2025
None on record
Genevieve Ualani Gorham Trustee 05 October 2024
None on record
Lewis Hobbs Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Liberty Rose Watts Trustee 17 September 2022
None on record
Bethan May Watson Trustee 11 September 2021
None on record
Nigel Hammett Trustee 26 September 2015
None on record
Dorian Crone Trustee 24 October 2012
None on record