Trustees THE MELDRETH PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 802278

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Collins | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Harris | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kylie Burge | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Moore | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Gregory | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sona Nogueira | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shahla Ellson | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lianne Beer | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Kirbyshire | Trustee | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE SUZANNE SAMWAYS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.