Accounts and annual returns THE HARMONY TRUST NO T131
Charity number: 802282
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 March 2010 | 02 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 March 2010 | 02 August 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | 02 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | 02 September 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | 10 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | 10 September 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | 23 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | 12 December 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | 14 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | 14 November 2006 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window