Financial history SUNNYSIDE PRESCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 802392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £126.26k £134.38k £125.43k £127.16k £172.69k
Total expenditure £130.63k £134.15k £130.80k £132.60k £161.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A