Accounts and annual returns AGE CONCERN HASTINGS

Charity Number: 802712
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 03 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 08 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 07 February 2007 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 07 February 2007 7 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 01 February 2005 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 01 February 2005 1 days late