Financial history THE FRIENDS OF STAINES PREP

Charity number: 802721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/04/2020 06/04/2021 06/04/2022 06/04/2023 06/04/2024
Total gross income £15.06k £0 £8.89k £11.02k £5.35k
Total expenditure £7.72k £0 £5.02k £9.68k £6.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A